Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Casinos -see also- Gaming

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0403
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 /CH0692 (SB0452)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Payout Percentages, Distribution of Proceeds, and Building Restrictions
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859 (SB0797)
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940 /CH0356
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298
Title
Gaming - Distribution of Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 (HB0532/CH0692)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0797 (HB0859)
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0403 Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0532 /CH0692 (SB0452) Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Payout Percentages, Distribution of Proceeds, and Building Restrictions Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0546 Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0859 (SB0797) Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0940 /CH0356 Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1298 Gaming - Distribution of Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0452 (HB0532/CH0692) Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0797 (HB0859) Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:16 AM
Click to return on the top page