Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Carroll County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399
Title
Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 (SB0613)
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818 (SB0558)
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 (SB0650)
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 (SB0612)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1132 (SB0839)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0818)
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 (HB1131)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB0794)
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650 (HB1094)
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839 (HB1132)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0399 Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0615 Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0794 (SB0613) Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0818 (SB0558) Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1094 (SB0650) Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1131 (SB0612) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1132 (SB0839) Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
SB0558 (HB0818) Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0612 (HB1131) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0613 (HB0794) Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0650 (HB1094) Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility Senator Klausmeier 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0839 (HB1132) Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 8:04 PM
Click to return on the top page