Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Caroline County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0217
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556 /CH0444 (SB0342)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620 /CH0547 (SB0341/CH0548)
Title
Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631
Title
Caroline County – Sunday Hunting – Authorizations
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 (SB0664)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0341 /CH0548 (HB0620/CH0547)
Title
Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0342 (HB0556/CH0444)
Title
Caroline County and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379
Title
Caroline County, Charles County, and Prince George's County Boards of Education - Removal of Member
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1144)
Title
Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0355 /CH0217 Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0556 /CH0444 (SB0342) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0620 /CH0547 (SB0341/CH0548) Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 547
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0631 Caroline County – Sunday Hunting – Authorizations Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 (SB0664) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0341 /CH0548 (HB0620/CH0547) Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries Caroline County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 548
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0342 (HB0556/CH0444) Caroline County and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0379 Caroline County, Charles County, and Prince George's County Boards of Education - Removal of Member Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 (HB1144) Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:11 PM
Click to return on the top page