Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

CARES Act

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495 /CH0763
Title
Income Tax - Internal Revenue Code Amendments - Decoupling
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 (SB0741)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Trade or Business Expenses Resulting in Federal Loan Forgiveness
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177 (SB0870)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - COVID-19-Related Distribution of Retirement Income
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1278 (SB0825)
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Study - Capacity and Accountability of State Department of Education
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 /CH0764
Title
Income Tax - Internal Revenue Code Amendments - Decoupling
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0647
Title
Federal COVID-19 Relief Funding - Report
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825 (HB1278)
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Study - Capacity and Accountability of State Department of Education
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 (HB1177)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - COVID-19-Related Distribution of Retirement Income
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0495 /CH0763 Income Tax - Internal Revenue Code Amendments - Decoupling Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 763
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0836 (SB0741) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Finance
HB1052 Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Trade or Business Expenses Resulting in Federal Loan Forgiveness Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1177 (SB0870) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - COVID-19-Related Distribution of Retirement Income Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1278 (SB0825) Department of Legislative Services - Study - Capacity and Accountability of State Department of Education Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0578 /CH0764 Income Tax - Internal Revenue Code Amendments - Decoupling Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 764
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0647 Federal COVID-19 Relief Funding - Report Senator King 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0825 (HB1278) Department of Legislative Services - Study - Capacity and Accountability of State Department of Education Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0870 (HB1177) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - COVID-19-Related Distribution of Retirement Income Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/2/2021 5:41 PM
Click to return on the top page