Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Caregivers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0195 /CH0739 (SB0817)
Title
Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215 /CH0034 (SB0226/CH0035)
Title
Human Services - Attendant Care Program - Ongoing Additional Supports
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331
Title
Election Law - Candidate Expenditures - Campaign-Related Caregiving Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission – Demographic Data Collection – Parental Status
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0644
Title
Family Law - Caretaker Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790 (SB0347)
Title
Medical Cannabis - Employees in Health Care Settings Caring for Qualifying Patients
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 (SB0708/CH0429)
Title
Family Law - Kinship Care
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 /CH0161
Title
Department of Aging - Caregiver Expense Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0035 (HB0215/CH0034)
Title
Human Services - Attendant Care Program - Ongoing Additional Supports
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 (HB0790)
Title
Medical Cannabis - Employees in Health Care Settings Caring for Qualifying Patients
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 /CH0429 (HB1499)
Title
Family Law - Kinship Care
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 (HB0195/CH0739)
Title
Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0195 /CH0739 (SB0817) Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 739
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0215 /CH0034 (SB0226/CH0035) Human Services - Attendant Care Program - Ongoing Additional Supports Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0331 Election Law - Candidate Expenditures - Campaign-Related Caregiving Expenses Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0463 Maryland Higher Education Commission – Demographic Data Collection – Parental Status Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/27/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0644 Family Law - Caretaker Bill of Rights Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0790 (SB0347) Medical Cannabis - Employees in Health Care Settings Caring for Qualifying Patients Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 (SB0708/CH0429) Family Law - Kinship Care Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0202 /CH0161 Department of Aging - Caregiver Expense Grant Program - Established Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0226 /CH0035 (HB0215/CH0034) Human Services - Attendant Care Program - Ongoing Additional Supports Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Finance
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0347 (HB0790) Medical Cannabis - Employees in Health Care Settings Caring for Qualifying Patients Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 /CH0429 (HB1499) Family Law - Kinship Care Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0817 (HB0195/CH0739) Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 2:40 PM
Click to return on the top page