Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Caregivers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010 /CH0498 (SB0048/CH0499)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318 (SB0441)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services (Self-Direction Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0598 /CH0771 (SB0469/CH0772)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706
Title
Medical Cannabis – Dispensary Grower–Processor License
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893
Title
Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962
Title
Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0983 /CH0789
Title
Nursing Homes - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation (The Gloria Daytz Lewis Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1281 (SB0844)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 (HB0806)
Title
Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0048 /CH0499 (HB0010/CH0498)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 (HB0318)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0469 /CH0772 (HB0598/CH0771)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844 (HB1281)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 /CH0498 (SB0048/CH0499) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Ways and Means
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0318 (SB0441) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services (Self-Direction Act) Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0598 /CH0771 (SB0469/CH0772) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0706 Medical Cannabis – Dispensary Grower–Processor License Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0893 Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0962 Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0983 /CH0789 Nursing Homes - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation (The Gloria Daytz Lewis Act) Delegate Lehman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1281 (SB0844) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0047 (HB0806) Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0048 /CH0499 (HB0010/CH0498) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499
Budget and Taxation
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
SB0441 (HB0318) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0469 /CH0772 (HB0598/CH0771) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement Senator Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 772
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0844 (HB1281) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page