Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Capital Budgets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351 (SB0361/CH0720)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2024, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, 2021, 2022, and 2023
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB0362/CH0717)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440 /CH0261 (SB1132)
Title
Howard County Public Schools - Differences in Capital Budget Proposals - Report Ho. Co. 16-24
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463 (SB0848)
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Capital Project Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Edelson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 /CH0720 (HB0351)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2024, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, 2021, 2022, and 2023
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362 /CH0717 (HB0352)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB1463)
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Capital Project Funding
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 /CH0722
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0973 /CH0790
Title
Hospitals - Private Hospital Grant Program - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1120 /CH0721
Title
University System of Maryland – Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1132 (HB1440/CH0261)
Title
Howard County Public Schools - Differences in Capital Budget Proposals - Report
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0184 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0351 (SB0361/CH0720) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2024, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, 2021, 2022, and 2023 Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0352 (SB0362/CH0717) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM
HB1440 /CH0261 (SB1132) Howard County Public Schools - Differences in Capital Budget Proposals - Report Ho. Co. 16-24 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Appropriations
3/12/2024 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1463 (SB0848) Enoch Pratt Free Library - Capital Project Funding Delegate Edelson 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations
Appropriations
SB0361 /CH0720 (HB0351) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2024, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, 2021, 2022, and 2023 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 720
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0362 /CH0717 (HB0352) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Budget and Taxation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0848 (HB1463) Enoch Pratt Free Library - Capital Project Funding Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 /CH0722 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0973 /CH0790 Hospitals - Private Hospital Grant Program - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 790
Budget and Taxation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1120 /CH0721 University System of Maryland – Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1132 (HB1440/CH0261) Howard County Public Schools - Differences in Capital Budget Proposals - Report Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page