Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Capital Budgets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0192
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Members - Training and Student Member Voting
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 (SB0291/CH0344)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2022, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, and 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0217
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 (SB0400)
Title
Transportation – Highway User Revenue – Distribution
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438 (SB0463)
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Funding Formulas - Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0608
Title
Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1388 (SB0594/CH0358)
Title
Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 /CH0344 (HB0301)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2022, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, and 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 (HB0410)
Title
Transportation – Highway User Revenue – Distribution
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463 (HB0438)
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Funding Formulas – Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474 /CH0063 (HB0838/CH0062)
Title
Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0594 /CH0358 (HB1388)
Title
Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0192 Baltimore County Board of Education - Members - Training and Student Member Voting Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0301 (SB0291/CH0344) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2022, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, and 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0355 /CH0217 Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0410 (SB0400) Transportation – Highway User Revenue – Distribution Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0438 (SB0463) Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Funding Formulas - Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Appropriations
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0608 Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1388 (SB0594/CH0358) Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0291 /CH0344 (HB0301) Creation of a State Debt – Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2022, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, and 2021 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0400 (HB0410) Transportation – Highway User Revenue – Distribution President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 (HB0438) Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Funding Formulas – Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0474 /CH0063 (HB0838/CH0062) Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Establishment Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0594 /CH0358 (HB1388) Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Budget and Taxation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 9:55 AM
Click to return on the top page