Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Capital Budgets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0086 (SB0228)
Title
Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings - Alterations (Green Building Restoration Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114 (SB0199)
Title
Transportation - Maryland Transit Administration Funding and MARC Rail Extension Study (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310 /CH0394 (SB0323/CH0395)
Title
Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0589
Title
St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590 /CH0063 (SB0492)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867 /CH0416 (SB0699/CH0417)
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887 /CH0502 (SB0060/CH0503)
Title
State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055
Title
Capital Budget - Legislative Initiatives - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374 /CH0576
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035 /CH0057 (HB0037/CH0058)
Title
Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 /CH0503 (HB0887/CH0502)
Title
State Debt - Annuity Bond Fund - Use of Bond Premiums
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199 (HB0114)
Title
Transportation - Maryland Transit Administration Funding and MARC Rail Extension Study (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 (HB0086)
Title
Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings - Alterations (Green Building Restoration Act)
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 /CH0395 (HB0310/CH0394)
Title
Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0492 (HB0590/CH0063)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 /CH0417 (HB0867/CH0416)
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program Fund
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0728
Title
Capital Projects - Minority Business Enterprise Goals
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0086 (SB0228) Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings - Alterations (Green Building Restoration Act) Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0114 (SB0199) Transportation - Maryland Transit Administration Funding and MARC Rail Extension Study (Transit Safety and Investment Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0310 /CH0394 (SB0323/CH0395) Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 394
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0528 /CH0589 St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0590 /CH0063 (SB0492) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 63
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0867 /CH0416 (SB0699/CH0417) Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program Fund Delegate Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 416
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0887 /CH0502 (SB0060/CH0503) State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums Delegate Chang 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1055 Capital Budget - Legislative Initiatives - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1374 /CH0576 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0035 /CH0057 (HB0037/CH0058) Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Applicability Senator Feldman 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 57
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0060 /CH0503 (HB0887/CH0502) State Debt - Annuity Bond Fund - Use of Bond Premiums Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 503
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0199 (HB0114) Transportation - Maryland Transit Administration Funding and MARC Rail Extension Study (Transit Safety and Investment Act) Senator McCray 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0228 (HB0086) Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings - Alterations (Green Building Restoration Act) Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0323 /CH0395 (HB0310/CH0394) Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 395
Budget and Taxation
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0492 (HB0590/CH0063) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0699 /CH0417 (HB0867/CH0416) Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program Fund Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 417
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0909 /CH0728 Capital Projects - Minority Business Enterprise Goals Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page