Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cannabis Distribution -see also- Cannabis, Cannabis Prod.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351 (SB0333)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837 /CH0026
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1478
Title
Hemp Farming Program - Use of Hemp and Hemp Products in Consumable Products
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333 (HB0351)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722
Title
Medical Cannabis - Licensees - Ownership Limitation Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844
Title
Medical Cannabis – Dispensaries – Operation at Multiple Locations
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Hemp Farming Program - Use of Hemp and Hemp Products in Consumable Products
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0351 (SB0333) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0837 /CH0026 Cannabis Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Judiciary
2/14/2022 - 10:00 AM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1478 Hemp Farming Program - Use of Hemp and Hemp Products in Consumable Products Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
SB0333 (HB0351) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0722 Medical Cannabis - Licensees - Ownership Limitation Exemption Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0844 Medical Cannabis – Dispensaries – Operation at Multiple Locations Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB1006 Hemp Farming Program - Use of Hemp and Hemp Products in Consumable Products Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page