Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Campaign Financing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017 /CH0109
Title
Campaign Finance – Recurring Contributions and Donations – Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0291 /CH0624 (SB0101/CH0625)
Title
Election Law - Contested Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340 (SB0015/CH0642)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Contributions (Prohibiting Pay to Play Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488
Title
Local Public Campaign Financing – Expansion to Additional Offices
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490
Title
Election Law - Campaign Contributions - Alterations and Prohibition on Sports Wagering Licensees
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Violation - Injunctive Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor Information
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721
Title
Election Law - Political Clubs
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0949
Title
Campaign Finance – Campaign Finance Reports – Prohibition on Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162
Title
Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0642 (HB0340)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 /CH0625 (HB0291/CH0624)
Title
Election Law - Contested Elections
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0264
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0358
Title
Public Financing Act – State Senate and House of Delegates
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895
Title
Declaration of Rights - Campaign Financing Right to Know
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 /CH0109 Campaign Finance – Recurring Contributions and Donations – Requirements Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Ways and Means
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0291 /CH0624 (SB0101/CH0625) Election Law - Contested Elections Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 624
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0340 (SB0015/CH0642) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Rules
HB0344 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Contributions (Prohibiting Pay to Play Act of 2022) Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0488 Local Public Campaign Financing – Expansion to Additional Offices Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0490 Election Law - Campaign Contributions - Alterations and Prohibition on Sports Wagering Licensees Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0491 Election Law - Campaign Finance Violation - Injunctive Relief Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0498 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor Information Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0721 Election Law - Political Clubs Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0949 Campaign Finance – Campaign Finance Reports – Prohibition on Disclosure Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
HB1162 Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0642 (HB0340) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Senator Jackson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0101 /CH0625 (HB0291/CH0624) Election Law - Contested Elections Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0239 /CH0264 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0358 Public Financing Act – State Senate and House of Delegates Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0895 Declaration of Rights - Campaign Financing Right to Know Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:15 PM
Click to return on the top page