Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Campaign Financing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136
Title
Election Law - Campaign Contributions - Alterations and Prohibition on Sports and Event Wagering Business Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0424 (SB0415/CH0733)
Title
Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433
Title
Montgomery County – Public Campaign Financing – Expansion MC 14–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0536 (SB0416)
Title
Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576
Title
Election Law - Political Clubs
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0691
Title
Election Law – Campaign Contributors – Disclosure of Owning or Controlling Individual or Business Entity
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0695
Title
State Board of Elections - Campaign Finance Reporting Database - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 (SB0632)
Title
Election Law - Postelection Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0949
Title
Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1066
Title
Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 /CH0647
Title
Campaign Finance - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1351
Title
Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor and Payment of Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352
Title
Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration Status
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0296
Title
Election Law – Campaign Finance – Protection of Contributor Information
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 /CH0321
Title
Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332
Title
Campaign Finance - For-Profit Substance Abuse and Mental Health Treatment Providers - Disclosure of Contributions
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Special Session of the General Assembly - Contributions Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 /CH0733 (HB0424)
Title
Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 (HB0536)
Title
Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0632 (HB0761)
Title
Election Law – Contested Elections
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0007
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0136 Election Law - Campaign Contributions - Alterations and Prohibition on Sports and Event Wagering Business Entities Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0424 (SB0415/CH0733) Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0433 Montgomery County – Public Campaign Financing – Expansion MC 14–21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0536 (SB0416) Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0576 Election Law - Political Clubs Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0691 Election Law – Campaign Contributors – Disclosure of Owning or Controlling Individual or Business Entity Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0695 State Board of Elections - Campaign Finance Reporting Database - Study Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0761 (SB0632) Election Law - Postelection Procedures Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0949 Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1066 Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1350 /CH0647 Campaign Finance - Revisions Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1351 Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor and Payment of Expenses Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1352 Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration Status Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0296 Election Law – Campaign Finance – Protection of Contributor Information Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0310 /CH0321 Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0332 Campaign Finance - For-Profit Substance Abuse and Mental Health Treatment Providers - Disclosure of Contributions Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0374 Maryland Public Ethics Law - Special Session of the General Assembly - Contributions Prohibited Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0415 /CH0733 (HB0424) Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act) Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0416 (HB0536) Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
SB0632 (HB0761) Election Law – Contested Elections Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SJ0007 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:20 AM
Click to return on the top page