Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Calvert County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 /CH0429 (SB0220)
Title
Calvert County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339 (SB0297)
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 /CH0470
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Explorers Grant Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842 /CH0604
Title
Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0886 /CH0761
Title
Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Compensation
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893 /CH0617 (SB0442)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Local Preference
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914 /CH0104
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Award of Multiyear Contracts
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190
Title
Calvert County - Civic Education - Standards and Curriculum (Social Studies Literacy Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0170/CH0429)
Title
Calvert County – Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297 (HB0339)
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0893/CH0617)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0315
Title
Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0170 /CH0429 (SB0220) Calvert County - Sunday Hunting Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0339 (SB0297) Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 /CH0470 Natural Resources - Maryland Park Explorers Grant Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0842 /CH0604 Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0846 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0886 /CH0761 Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Compensation Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0893 /CH0617 (SB0442) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0913 Calvert County - Procurement - Local Preference Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0914 /CH0104 Calvert County - Procurement - Award of Multiyear Contracts Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1190 Calvert County - Civic Education - Standards and Curriculum (Social Studies Literacy Act) Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0220 (HB0170/CH0429) Calvert County – Sunday Hunting Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0297 (HB0339) Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0442 (HB0893/CH0617) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2022 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0496 /CH0315 Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:32 PM
Click to return on the top page