Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Calvert County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0197 (SB0448/CH0198)
Title
County Boards of Education – Student Transportation – Vehicles and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655
Title
Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 /CH0334
Title
Calvert County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0802 (SB0356)
Title
Calvert County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1016 /CH0304
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160 /CH0623
Title
Calvert County – Long–Term Contracts for Cellular Tower Leases
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173 /CH0729
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1357 (SB0945)
Title
Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0356 (HB0802)
Title
Calvert County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 /CH0198 (HB0072/CH0197)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles and Report
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0945 (HB1357)
Title
Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966
Title
Virtual Schools – Statewide Education Platform – Procurement and Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0197 (SB0448/CH0198) County Boards of Education – Student Transportation – Vehicles and Report Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Ways and Means
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0615 Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0655 Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0801 /CH0334 Calvert County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0802 (SB0356) Calvert County - Sunday Hunting Delegate Clark 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1016 /CH0304 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1160 /CH0623 Calvert County – Long–Term Contracts for Cellular Tower Leases Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1168 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1173 /CH0729 Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1174 State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1357 (SB0945) Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0356 (HB0802) Calvert County - Sunday Hunting Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0448 /CH0198 (HB0072/CH0197) County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles and Report Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0945 (HB1357) Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 Virtual Schools – Statewide Education Platform – Procurement and Establishment Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page