Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Horse Racing (C6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 (SB0679/CH0269)
Title
Fair Hill Improvement Fund - Special Event Area and Operations
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 /CH0257 (SB0792/CH0256)
Title
Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679 /CH0269 (HB0658)
Title
Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0256 (HB0942/CH0257)
Title
Horse Racing – Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0658 (SB0679/CH0269) Fair Hill Improvement Fund - Special Event Area and Operations Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0942 /CH0257 (SB0792/CH0256) Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0679 /CH0269 (HB0658) Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0792 /CH0256 (HB0942/CH0257) Horse Racing – Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders – Alterations Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:46 AM
Click to return on the top page