Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Business Occupations and Professions (C3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292 (SB0555)
Title
Occupational Licensing Boards and Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Reporting Disciplinary Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448 /CH0108
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568 /CH0649 (SB0425/CH0650)
Title
Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons – Compensation – Payment From Title Insurance Producer
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 (SB0632/CH0483)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business and Nonprofit Health Insurance Subsidies Program - Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807 /CH0333
Title
Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Verification of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1000
Title
Maryland Earn and Learn Act of 2022 - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement and Cost Sharing
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014 (SB0690)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Definitions of Carrier, ERISA, and Purchaser
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265
Title
Barbers and Cosmetologists - Licensure Requirements - Review and Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285 /CH0655 (SB0604/CH0656)
Title
Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1457
Title
Real Estate Transactions - Prospective Buyer Communications - Personal Information
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111
Title
Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Pre-application Determinations - Criminal Convictions
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167 /CH0120
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0425 /CH0650 (HB0568/CH0649)
Title
Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons - Compensation - Payment From Title Insurance Producer
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 (HB0292)
Title
Occupational Licensing Boards and Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Reporting Disciplinary Activities
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 /CH0656 (HB1285/CH0655)
Title
Maryland Electricians Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0632 /CH0483 (HB0709)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business and Nonprofit Health Insurance Subsidies Program - Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690 (HB1014)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definitions of Carrier, ERISA, and Purchaser
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0292 (SB0555) Occupational Licensing Boards and Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Reporting Disciplinary Activities Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2022 - 3:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0448 /CH0108 State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Economic Matters
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0568 /CH0649 (SB0425/CH0650) Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons – Compensation – Payment From Title Insurance Producer Delegate Carey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0709 (SB0632/CH0483) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business and Nonprofit Health Insurance Subsidies Program - Workgroup Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2022 - 1:30 PM
Rules
HB0807 /CH0333 Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Verification of Identity Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1000 Maryland Earn and Learn Act of 2022 - Establishment Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Economic Matters
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1009 Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement and Cost Sharing Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1014 (SB0690) Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Definitions of Carrier, ERISA, and Purchaser Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1265 Barbers and Cosmetologists - Licensure Requirements - Review and Regulations Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1285 /CH0655 (SB0604/CH0656) Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions Delegate Hornberger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 655
Economic Matters
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1457 Real Estate Transactions - Prospective Buyer Communications - Personal Information Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0111 Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Pre-application Determinations - Criminal Convictions Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0167 /CH0120 Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0425 /CH0650 (HB0568/CH0649) Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons - Compensation - Payment From Title Insurance Producer Senator Reilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0555 (HB0292) Occupational Licensing Boards and Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Reporting Disciplinary Activities Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0604 /CH0656 (HB1285/CH0655) Maryland Electricians Act – Revisions Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0632 /CH0483 (HB0709) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business and Nonprofit Health Insurance Subsidies Program - Workgroup Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0690 (HB1014) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definitions of Carrier, ERISA, and Purchaser Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:23 PM
Click to return on the top page