Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Corporations and Associations (C1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 /CH0664
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 (SB0065)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 (SB0145)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Property Insurance Deductibles - Member Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0342 /CH0294 (SB0261/CH0295)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Operating Agreements and Partnership Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 /CH0287 (SB0447/CH0288)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401
Title
Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409 (SB0403)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Fees for Electronic Filings
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722
Title
Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852
Title
Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853 /CH0317 (SB0125/CH0316)
Title
Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996 /CH0289 (SB0879/CH0290)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 /CH0292 (SB0431/CH0293)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065 (HB0117)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125 /CH0316 (HB0853/CH0317)
Title
Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145 (HB0197)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations – Property Insurance Deductibles – Member Responsibility
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258
Title
Real Estate Investment Trust Modernization Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 /CH0295 (HB0342/CH0294)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Operating Agreements and Partnership Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0403 (HB0409)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Annual Reports – Fees for Electronic Filings
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431 /CH0293 (HB0999/CH0292)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 /CH0288 (HB0390/CH0287)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879 /CH0290 (HB0996/CH0289)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0107 /CH0664 Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Environment and Transportation
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0117 (SB0065) Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0197 (SB0145) Cooperative Housing Corporations - Property Insurance Deductibles - Member Responsibility Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0342 /CH0294 (SB0261/CH0295) Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Operating Agreements and Partnership Agreements Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
HB0390 /CH0287 (SB0447/CH0288) Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Economic Matters
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0401 Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0409 (SB0403) Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Fees for Electronic Filings Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Delegate Healey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0722 Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0852 Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0853 /CH0317 (SB0125/CH0316) Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations Delegate Saab 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Economic Matters
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0996 /CH0289 (SB0879/CH0290) Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Economic Matters
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0999 /CH0292 (SB0431/CH0293) Corporations and Associations – Revisions Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Economic Matters
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0065 (HB0117) Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0125 /CH0316 (HB0853/CH0317) Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0145 (HB0197) Cooperative Housing Corporations – Property Insurance Deductibles – Member Responsibility Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0258 Real Estate Investment Trust Modernization Act Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0261 /CH0295 (HB0342/CH0294) Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Operating Agreements and Partnership Agreements Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0403 (HB0409) Corporations and Associations – Annual Reports – Fees for Electronic Filings President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2022 - 2:30 PM
SB0431 /CH0293 (HB0999/CH0292) Corporations and Associations - Revisions Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0447 /CH0288 (HB0390/CH0287) Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0879 /CH0290 (HB0996/CH0289) Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:19 PM
Click to return on the top page