Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Corporations and Associations (C1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0406
Title
Corporations and Associations – Filing Fee Study
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 /CH0433
Title
Montgomery County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies MC 3-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647 /CH0142 (SB0942)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0648 /CH0273 (SB0561/CH0274)
Title
Electric Cooperatives – Meetings – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 /CH0581 (SB0444/CH0582)
Title
Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 /CH0779 (SB0263/CH0780)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts – Miscellaneous
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 /CH0335
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Lists of Business Entities Not Filing Annual Report
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153 /CH0794
Title
Names of Entities With Physician Membership – Approval Requirement – Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106
Title
Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181 /CH0106
Title
Corporations and Associations - Trade Name Certificates - Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 /CH0780 (HB0781/CH0779)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0301
Title
Corporations – Board Members and Executive Officers Diversity – Procurement Preference and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 /CH0107
Title
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 /CH0428
Title
Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 /CH0582 (HB0658/CH0581)
Title
Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561 /CH0274 (HB0648/CH0273)
Title
Electric Cooperatives - Meetings - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942 (HB0647/CH0142)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0313 Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0356 /CH0406 Corporations and Associations – Filing Fee Study Delegate Qi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 406
Economic Matters
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0567 /CH0433 Montgomery County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies MC 3-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 433
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0647 /CH0142 (SB0942) Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0648 /CH0273 (SB0561/CH0274) Electric Cooperatives – Meetings – Alterations Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0658 /CH0581 (SB0444/CH0582) Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland) Delegate Qi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0779 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0781 /CH0779 (SB0263/CH0780) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts – Miscellaneous Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 779
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0825 Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Delegate Healey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 /CH0335 State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Lists of Business Entities Not Filing Annual Report Delegate Qi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1153 /CH0794 Names of Entities With Physician Membership – Approval Requirement – Exemption Delegate Adams 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 794
Economic Matters
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
SB0106 Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (92-42)
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0181 /CH0106 Corporations and Associations - Trade Name Certificates - Requirements Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0263 /CH0780 (HB0781/CH0779) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 780
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0301 Corporations – Board Members and Executive Officers Diversity – Procurement Preference and Reporting Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0320 /CH0107 Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0335 /CH0428 Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements Senator Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 428
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0444 /CH0582 (HB0658/CH0581) Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland) Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0561 /CH0274 (HB0648/CH0273) Electric Cooperatives - Meetings - Alterations Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0942 (HB0647/CH0142) Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page