Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Buses -see also- School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010 (SB0061/CH0463)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 /CH0468
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060 (SB0126)
Title
Environment – New Motor Vehicles – Pollution Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0064
Title
State Highways – Designated Shoulder Areas – Establishment and Use by Transit Buses
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0065
Title
Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Bus Stops
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 (SB0299/CH0078)
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171 (SB0135)
Title
Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750 (SB0422)
Title
Education - Jobs That Require Driving - Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 /CH0061
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055
Title
Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School Students and Youth Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0463 (HB0010)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions)
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 (HB0060)
Title
Environment - New Motor Vehicles - Pollution Fee
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0171)
Title
Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208
Title
Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 /CH0078 (HB0136)
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 (HB0750)
Title
Education – Jobs That Require Driving – Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 (HB0695)
Title
Environment - Climate Crisis Plan - Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 (SB0061/CH0463) Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions) Delegate Korman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0053 /CH0468 Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0060 (SB0126) Environment – New Motor Vehicles – Pollution Fee Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0064 State Highways – Designated Shoulder Areas – Establishment and Use by Transit Buses Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0065 Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Bus Stops Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0136 (SB0299/CH0078) Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act) Delegate Kerr 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0171 (SB0135) Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0750 (SB0422) Education - Jobs That Require Driving - Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022) Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0897 /CH0061 Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1055 Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School Students and Youth Workers Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0061 /CH0463 (HB0010) Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions) Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0126 (HB0060) Environment - New Motor Vehicles - Pollution Fee Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0135 (HB0171) Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0208 Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0299 /CH0078 (HB0136) Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act) Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 (HB0750) Education – Jobs That Require Driving – Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0552 (HB0695) Environment - Climate Crisis Plan - Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 10:52 AM
Click to return on the top page