Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Building Permits

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0035 /CH0971 (SB0276)
Title
Property Tax - Submission of Building Permits to Supervisor of Assessments - Estimated Construction Cost
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 /CH0213
Title
Housing Development Permit Applications - Local Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use and Electric–Ready Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265 (SB1054)
Title
Local Government – Building Permits for Residential Solar Energy and Residential Energy Storage Systems – Required Platform and Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 (SB1023)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric- and Solar-Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 (HB0035/CH0971)
Title
Property Tax - Submission of Building Permits to Supervisor of Assessments - Estimated Construction Cost
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 /CH0595 (HB1435)
Title
Public Utilities - Solar Energy Systems and Programs, Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund, and Prevailing Wage (Brighter Tomorrow Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023 (HB1279)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric– and Solar–Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1265)
Title
Local Government - Building Permits for Residential Solar Energy and Residential Energy Storage Systems - Required Platform and Inspections
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0035 /CH0971 (SB0276) Property Tax - Submission of Building Permits to Supervisor of Assessments - Estimated Construction Cost Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 971
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
HB0131 /CH0213 Housing Development Permit Applications - Local Reporting Requirements Delegate Stewart 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0210 Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use and Electric–Ready Standards Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2024 - 1:15 PM
Economic Matters
HB1265 (SB1054) Local Government – Building Permits for Residential Solar Energy and Residential Energy Storage Systems – Required Platform and Inspections Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1279 (SB1023) Maryland Building Performance Standards - Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric- and Solar-Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024) Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0276 (HB0035/CH0971) Property Tax - Submission of Building Permits to Supervisor of Assessments - Estimated Construction Cost Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 /CH0595 (HB1435) Public Utilities - Solar Energy Systems and Programs, Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund, and Prevailing Wage (Brighter Tomorrow Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB1023 (HB1279) Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric– and Solar–Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024) Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/04/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 (HB1265) Local Government - Building Permits for Residential Solar Energy and Residential Energy Storage Systems - Required Platform and Inspections Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page