Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Building Permits

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016 (SB0478)
Title
Correctional Services – Immigration Detention – Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111
Title
Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0160
Title
Environment – Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0414)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328 (SB0824)
Title
Economic Development – Broadband Providers – Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0583)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0478 (HB0016)
Title
Correctional Services – Immigration Detention – Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 (HB1328)
Title
Economic Development - Broadband Providers - Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 (SB0478) Correctional Services – Immigration Detention – Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0111 Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0160 Environment – Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0583 (SB0414) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB1328 (SB0824) Economic Development – Broadband Providers – Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0414 (HB0583) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0478 (HB0016) Correctional Services – Immigration Detention – Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0824 (HB1328) Economic Development - Broadband Providers - Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021) Senator Hester 6 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page