Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 /CH0292 (SB0046/CH0291)
Title
Condominiums - Sales Contracts - Asbestos Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159 /CH0268 (SB0465/CH0269)
Title
Common Ownership Communities - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use and Electric–Ready Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395
Title
Prince George's County - Early Childhood Education Program and High School Child Care Centers - Established PG 504-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577 /CH0151 (SB1107/CH0152)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Study on the Establishment of a Homeless Shelter Licensing Program
Sponsor
Delegate Grossman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 /CH0373
Title
Prince George's County Family Child Care Home Expansion Grant Program - Establishment PG 505-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841
Title
Environment - Plastic Bottle Waste Reduction - Water Bottle Filling Stations and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889 (SB0695)
Title
Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0926 /CH0206 (SB1033/CH0205)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards – Local Requests for Guidance – Religious Considerations
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 (SB1023)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric- and Solar-Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 /CH0291 (HB0143/CH0292)
Title
Condominiums - Sales Contracts - Asbestos Disclosure
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards – Apartment Building Height Allowances – Study and Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 /CH0269 (HB0159/CH0268)
Title
Common Ownership Communities - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB0889)
Title
Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023 (HB1279)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric– and Solar–Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1033 /CH0205 (HB0926/CH0206)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Local Requests for Guidance - Religious Considerations
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1107 /CH0152 (HB0577/CH0151)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Study on the Establishment of a Homeless Shelter Licensing Program
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0143 /CH0292 (SB0046/CH0291) Condominiums - Sales Contracts - Asbestos Disclosure Delegate Foley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0159 /CH0268 (SB0465/CH0269) Common Ownership Communities - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Act of 2024) Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0210 Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use and Electric–Ready Standards Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2024 - 1:15 PM
Economic Matters
HB0395 Prince George's County - Early Childhood Education Program and High School Child Care Centers - Established PG 504-24 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0577 /CH0151 (SB1107/CH0152) Housing and Community Development - Study on the Establishment of a Homeless Shelter Licensing Program Delegate Grossman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2024 - 12:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0838 /CH0373 Prince George's County Family Child Care Home Expansion Grant Program - Establishment PG 505-24 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0841 Environment - Plastic Bottle Waste Reduction - Water Bottle Filling Stations and Reporting Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0889 (SB0695) Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0926 /CH0206 (SB1033/CH0205) Maryland Building Performance Standards – Local Requests for Guidance – Religious Considerations Delegate Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1279 (SB1023) Maryland Building Performance Standards - Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric- and Solar-Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024) Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0046 /CH0291 (HB0143/CH0292) Condominiums - Sales Contracts - Asbestos Disclosure Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0352 Maryland Building Performance Standards – Apartment Building Height Allowances – Study and Alterations Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0465 /CH0269 (HB0159/CH0268) Common Ownership Communities - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Act of 2024) Senator Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0695 (HB0889) Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/04/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 (HB1279) Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric– and Solar–Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024) Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/04/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1033 /CH0205 (HB0926/CH0206) Maryland Building Performance Standards - Local Requests for Guidance - Religious Considerations Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2024 - 9:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB1107 /CH0152 (HB0577/CH0151) Housing and Community Development - Study on the Establishment of a Homeless Shelter Licensing Program Senator Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2024 11:54 AM
Click to return on the top page