Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Boats and Ships

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 /CH0442 (SB0324/CH0443)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696
Title
Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855 (SB0017/CH0144)
Title
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0926
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties (Josette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 /CH0144 (HB0855)
Title
Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321
Title
Anne Arundel County – Operation of Vessels in Controlled Water Ski Area in Maynadier Creek – Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 /CH0443 (HB0204/CH0442)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418
Title
Maryland Energy Administration – Energy and Water Efficiency Standards – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0204 /CH0442 (SB0324/CH0443) Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0696 Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0855 (SB0017/CH0144) Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law) Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0926 Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties (Josette's Law) Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1164 Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1174 State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
SB0017 /CH0144 (HB0855) Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law) Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0321 Anne Arundel County – Operation of Vessels in Controlled Water Ski Area in Maynadier Creek – Sunset Repeal Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0324 /CH0443 (HB0204/CH0442) Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0346 Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0418 Maryland Energy Administration – Energy and Water Efficiency Standards – Alterations Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page