Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Blind Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511
Title
Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0471 (SB0507/CH0472)
Title
Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651 (SB0464)
Title
Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1054 /CH0423 (SB0720/CH0424)
Title
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Pay Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 (SB0921)
Title
County Boards of Education - Accessibility Standards - Digital Tools (Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for Grades K-12 Education)
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 (SB0635)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises – Calculation of Participation Rates – Exemption for Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises – Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0464 (HB0651)
Title
Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507 /CH0472 (HB0554/CH0471)
Title
Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0635 (HB1302)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises – Calculation of Participation Rates – Exemption for Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises – Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0720 /CH0424 (HB1054/CH0423)
Title
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Pay Plan
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0921 (HB1181)
Title
County Boards of Education - Accessibility Standards - Digital Tools (Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for Grades K-12 Education)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0511 Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0554 /CH0471 (SB0507/CH0472) Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 471
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2021 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB0651 (SB0464) Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1054 /CH0423 (SB0720/CH0424) Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Pay Plan Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 423
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1181 (SB0921) County Boards of Education - Accessibility Standards - Digital Tools (Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for Grades K-12 Education) Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1302 (SB0635) Minority Business Enterprises – Calculation of Participation Rates – Exemption for Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises – Repeal Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0464 (HB0651) Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0507 /CH0472 (HB0554/CH0471) Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 472
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0635 (HB1302) Minority Business Enterprises – Calculation of Participation Rates – Exemption for Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises – Repeal Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0720 /CH0424 (HB1054/CH0423) Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Pay Plan Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 424
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0921 (HB1181) County Boards of Education - Accessibility Standards - Digital Tools (Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for Grades K-12 Education) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:10 PM
Click to return on the top page