Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Birth Control -see also- Reproductive Matters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0757 (SB0084/CH0758)
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0758 /CH0462 (SB0684/CH0463)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084 /CH0758 (HB0135/CH0757)
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 /CH0463 (HB0758/CH0462)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 /CH0757 (SB0084/CH0758) Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act) Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 757
Health and Government Operations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0758 /CH0462 (SB0684/CH0463) Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 462
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0084 /CH0758 (HB0135/CH0757) Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act) Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0684 /CH0463 (HB0758/CH0462) Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 463
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page