Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Biometrics -see also- Artificial Intelli; Fingerprinting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034 (SB0204)
Title
Interstate Social Work Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 /CH0809 (SB0182/CH0808)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 (SB0359)
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 /CH0454 (SB0541/CH0455)
Title
Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 /CH0461 (SB0571/CH0460)
Title
Consumer Protection - Online Products and Services - Data of Children (Maryland Kids Code)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001
Title
Motor Vehicles - Automated Enforcement Programs - Privacy Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156 (SB0930)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Wire Transfers - Liability (Elder Fraud Prevention Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Criminal Law - Obscene Material - Device Filters
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460
Title
Criminal Law – Personal Identifying Information and Images of Minors – Dissemination
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 /CH0808 (HB0338/CH0809)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 (HB0034)
Title
Interstate Social Work Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359 (HB0425)
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0455 (HB0567/CH0454)
Title
Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 /CH0460 (HB0603/CH0461)
Title
Consumer Protection – Online Products and Services – Data of Children (Maryland Kids Code)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930 (HB1156)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Wire Transfers – Liability (Elder Fraud Prevention Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 (SB0204) Interstate Social Work Licensure Compact Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0338 /CH0809 (SB0182/CH0808) Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 809
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0425 (SB0359) Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0567 /CH0454 (SB0541/CH0455) Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024 Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Economic Matters
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 /CH0461 (SB0571/CH0460) Consumer Protection - Online Products and Services - Data of Children (Maryland Kids Code) Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Economic Matters
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1001 Motor Vehicles - Automated Enforcement Programs - Privacy Protections Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1156 (SB0930) Commercial Law - Consumer Wire Transfers - Liability (Elder Fraud Prevention Act of 2024) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1311 Criminal Law - Obscene Material - Device Filters Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1460 Criminal Law – Personal Identifying Information and Images of Minors – Dissemination Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0182 /CH0808 (HB0338/CH0809) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 808
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0204 (HB0034) Interstate Social Work Licensure Compact Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0359 (HB0425) Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 /CH0455 (HB0567/CH0454) Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024 Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Finance
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 /CH0460 (HB0603/CH0461) Consumer Protection – Online Products and Services – Data of Children (Maryland Kids Code) Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Finance
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0930 (HB1156) Commercial Law – Consumer Wire Transfers – Liability (Elder Fraud Prevention Act of 2024) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page