Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Bingo

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339 (SB0297)
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1316 (SB0858)
Title
Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297 (HB0339)
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858 (HB1316)
Title
Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995
Title
Gaming - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0339 (SB0297) Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0846 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1316 (SB0858) Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0297 (HB0339) Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0858 (HB1316) Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0995 Gaming - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - Expansion Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/9/2022 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page