Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Beverage Containers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135
Title
Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0138 (SB0273/CH0139)
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307 (SB0292)
Title
Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 /CH0756 (SB0481)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Service Under Stadium License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671 /CH0758 (SB0495)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Abolishment of Liquor Control Board and Dispensary System
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Tax - Ready-to-Drink Cocktails
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106 /CH0763
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Wine
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239
Title
Environment - Plastic and Glass Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1388 (SB0594/CH0358)
Title
Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0139 (HB0275/CH0138)
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292 (HB0307)
Title
Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 (HB0493/CH0756)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Service Under Stadium License
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0495 (HB0671/CH0758)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Abolishment of Liquor Control Board and Dispensary System
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0594 /CH0358 (HB1388)
Title
Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Tax - Ready-to-Drink Cocktails
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0275 /CH0138 (SB0273/CH0139) Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act) Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0307 (SB0292) Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0493 /CH0756 (SB0481) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Service Under Stadium License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 756
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0671 /CH0758 (SB0495) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Abolishment of Liquor Control Board and Dispensary System Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0867 Alcoholic Beverage Tax - Ready-to-Drink Cocktails Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1106 /CH0763 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Wine Washington County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 763
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1239 Environment - Plastic and Glass Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
HB1388 (SB0594/CH0358) Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0273 /CH0139 (HB0275/CH0138) Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0292 (HB0307) Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0481 (HB0493/CH0756) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Service Under Stadium License Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0495 (HB0671/CH0758) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Abolishment of Liquor Control Board and Dispensary System Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0594 /CH0358 (HB1388) Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Budget and Taxation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0793 Alcoholic Beverage Tax - Ready-to-Drink Cocktails Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page