Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Beverage Containers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0140 (SB0205/CH0141)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022 (SB0195)
Title
Environment - PFAS Chemicals - Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036
Title
Environment – Packaging, Containers, and Paper Products – Producer Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099
Title
Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 /CH0527
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sales - Required Multiple Purchases
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 /CH0531
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Draft Beer for Off-Site Consumption in Damascus MC 12-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0547 (SB0489/CH0548)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT License
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152 /CH0661
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 /CH0564 (SB0693/CH0565)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241 (SB0791)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Licenses - Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1242 /CH0561 (SB0793/CH0562)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0195 (HB0022)
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 /CH0141 (HB0012/CH0140)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0548 (HB0679/CH0547)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT License
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 /CH0565 (HB1240/CH0564)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB1241)
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B Licenses – Off–Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0562 (HB1242/CH0561)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 /CH0140 (SB0205/CH0141) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0022 (SB0195) Environment - PFAS Chemicals - Prohibitions and Requirements Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2021 - 3:45 PM
HB0036 Environment – Packaging, Containers, and Paper Products – Producer Responsibility Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0069 Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0099 Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0185 /CH0527 Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sales - Required Multiple Purchases Delegate Branch, T. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0432 /CH0531 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Draft Beer for Off-Site Consumption in Damascus MC 12-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 /CH0547 (SB0489/CH0548) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT License Delegate Rogers 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 547
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1152 /CH0661 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1240 /CH0564 (SB0693/CH0565) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1241 (SB0791) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Licenses - Off-Premises Consumption Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1242 /CH0561 (SB0793/CH0562) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 561
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0195 (HB0022) Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0205 /CH0141 (HB0012/CH0140) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0489 /CH0548 (HB0679/CH0547) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT License Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 548
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0693 /CH0565 (HB1240/CH0564) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 565
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0791 (HB1241) Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B Licenses – Off–Premises Consumption Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0793 /CH0562 (HB1242/CH0561) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:16 AM
Click to return on the top page