Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Beneficiaries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029 (SB0053)
Title
Real Property - Transfer to Heir - Exemption From Prepayment
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 /CH0771
Title
Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vessel Transfers - Excise Tax and Title Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 /CH0315 (SB0075/CH0314)
Title
Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325 /CH0316 (SB0164/CH0317)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 /CH0319 (SB0080/CH0318)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0591
Title
Real Property - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Exemption From Payment
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1011
Title
Vessel Transfers - Excise Tax and Title Fee Exemption and Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064 /CH0416 (SB0897/CH0417)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Death Benefits – Law Enforcement Officers and Fire Fighters
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1434
Title
Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Restoration of Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interpretation of Wills - Extrinsic Evidence of Intent (Granny's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 (HB0029)
Title
Real Property - Transfer to Heir - Exemption From Prepayment
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075 /CH0314 (HB0324/CH0315)
Title
Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 /CH0257 (HB0068/CH0258)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Transparency, Grievances, and Unit Reoccupancy
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0318 (HB0326/CH0319)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164 /CH0317 (HB0325/CH0316)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0897 /CH0417 (HB1064/CH0416)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Death Benefits – Law Enforcement Officers and Fire Fighters
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0029 (SB0053) Real Property - Transfer to Heir - Exemption From Prepayment Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0054 /CH0771 Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0294 Estates and Trusts - Vessel Transfers - Excise Tax and Title Fee Exemption Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0324 /CH0315 (SB0075/CH0314) Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0325 /CH0316 (SB0164/CH0317) Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0326 /CH0319 (SB0080/CH0318) Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0591 Real Property - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Exemption From Payment Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1011 Vessel Transfers - Excise Tax and Title Fee Exemption and Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1064 /CH0416 (SB0897/CH0417) Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Death Benefits – Law Enforcement Officers and Fire Fighters Delegate Hartman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1434 Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Restoration of Benefits Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Appropriations
3/05/2024 - 12:30 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1518 Estates and Trusts - Interpretation of Wills - Extrinsic Evidence of Intent (Granny's Law) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0053 (HB0029) Real Property - Transfer to Heir - Exemption From Prepayment Senator Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0075 /CH0314 (HB0324/CH0315) Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2024 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0076 /CH0257 (HB0068/CH0258) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Transparency, Grievances, and Unit Reoccupancy Senator Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Finance
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0080 /CH0318 (HB0326/CH0319) Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
SB0164 /CH0317 (HB0325/CH0316) Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2024 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0897 /CH0417 (HB1064/CH0416) Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Death Benefits – Law Enforcement Officers and Fire Fighters Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2024 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:38 PM
Click to return on the top page