Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Beneficiaries -see also- Estates and Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 (SB0409/CH0355)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – COVID–19–Related Death Benefits – Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0353 (SB0502)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 /CH0401 (SB0092/CH0402)
Title
Real Property - Partition of Property
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers and Purchasers - Beneficiary Choice of Pharmacy
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement and Cost Sharing
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB0853)
Title
Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0402 (HB0777/CH0401)
Title
Real Property - Partition of Property
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 /CH0355 (HB0742)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – COVID–19–Related Death Benefits – Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0502 (HB0744/CH0353)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 (HB1270)
Title
Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0742 (SB0409/CH0355) State Retirement and Pension System – COVID–19–Related Death Benefits – Sunset Extension Delegate Lierman 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0744 /CH0353 (SB0502) State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections Delegate Lierman 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Appropriations
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0777 /CH0401 (SB0092/CH0402) Real Property - Partition of Property Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB0954 Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1008 Pharmacy Benefits Managers and Purchasers - Beneficiary Choice of Pharmacy Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1009 Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement and Cost Sharing Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1270 (SB0853) Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0092 /CH0402 (HB0777/CH0401) Real Property - Partition of Property Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judiciary
SB0409 /CH0355 (HB0742) State Retirement and Pension System – COVID–19–Related Death Benefits – Sunset Extension Senator Elfreth 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2022 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0502 (HB0744/CH0353) State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections Senator Elfreth 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2022 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0853 (HB1270) Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page