Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Barbers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118 /CH0766 (SB0415/CH0767)
Title
Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265
Title
Barbers and Cosmetologists - Licensure Requirements - Review and Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 /CH0767 (HB1118/CH0766)
Title
Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1118 /CH0766 (SB0415/CH0767) Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 766
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1265 Barbers and Cosmetologists - Licensure Requirements - Review and Regulations Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0415 /CH0767 (HB1118/CH0766) Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 767
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:32 PM
Click to return on the top page