Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Banks and Trust Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322
Title
Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0599
Title
Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0600
Title
Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0984
Title
Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 (SB0885/CH0391)
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Equity Investment Fund - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0322 Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0528 /CH0599 Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 /CH0600 Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0984 Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1479 (SB0885/CH0391) Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Equity Investment Fund - Established Delegate Lierman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:14 PM
Click to return on the top page