Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Ballots

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212
Title
Election Law - Signature Verification of Absentee Ballots and Absentee Ballot Applications and Ballot Canvassing
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Election Law - Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428
Title
Election Law - Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems - Notification and Termination of Contract
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 (SB0088)
Title
Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225
Title
Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337
Title
Elections - Delegate Contests - Repeal of Residency Prohibition and Ballot Content Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1434
Title
Procurement - Ballot Printing Services Contracts - Board of Public Works Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1485
Title
Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 (HB0707)
Title
Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112
Title
Election Law - False Ballot Drop Boxes - Criminal Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0212 Election Law - Signature Verification of Absentee Ballots and Absentee Ballot Applications and Ballot Canvassing Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 Election Law - Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Elections Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0329 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0428 Election Law - Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems - Notification and Termination of Contract Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0707 (SB0088) Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor Delegate Barve 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0862 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Delegate Feldmark 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1225 Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1337 Elections - Delegate Contests - Repeal of Residency Prohibition and Ballot Content Requirement Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1434 Procurement - Ballot Printing Services Contracts - Board of Public Works Approval Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1485 Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery - Collective Bargaining Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations
Appropriations
SB0088 (HB0707) Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0112 Election Law - False Ballot Drop Boxes - Criminal Penalty Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0163 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Senator Kagan 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0352 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 10:54 AM
Click to return on the top page