Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Capital Budget (B5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 (SB0291/CH0344)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2022, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, and 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438 (SB0463)
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Funding Formulas - Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0541/CH0039)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088 /CH0029
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Annual Appropriation and Alterations
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 /CH0344 (HB0301)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2022, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, and 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463 (HB0438)
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Funding Formulas – Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1007 /CH0233
Title
University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0301 (SB0291/CH0344) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2022, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, and 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0438 (SB0463) Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Funding Formulas - Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Appropriations
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0727 (SB0541/CH0039) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1088 /CH0029 African American Heritage Preservation Program - Annual Appropriation and Alterations Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0291 /CH0344 (HB0301) Creation of a State Debt – Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2022, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, and 2021 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0463 (HB0438) Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Funding Formulas – Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB1007 /CH0233 University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2022 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:10 PM
Click to return on the top page