Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 (SB0861/CH0731)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 (SB0612/CH0730)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173 /CH0729
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 /CH0730 (HB1131)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 /CH0731 (HB0813)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0813 (SB0861/CH0731) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1131 (SB0612/CH0730) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1173 /CH0729 Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0612 /CH0730 (HB1131) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0861 /CH0731 (HB0813) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond Senator Bailey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:22 AM
Click to return on the top page