Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Awards, Medals, and Prizes -see also- Gaming

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899
Title
Higher Education - Scholarship Program - Eagle Scout and Girl Scout Gold Award Recipients
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0945 /CH0275
Title
Carroll County - Multi-Drawing Raffles
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0950
Title
Public Schools - Civics Education Award Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100 /CH0594 (SB0806)
Title
Child Care Providers and Employees - Bonuses
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 (SB0155)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1394
Title
Gaming - Skills-Based Gaming Devices - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452
Title
Natural Resources - Female Deer Hunting Contests - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 (HB1257)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0806 (HB1100/CH0594)
Title
Child Care Providers and Employees – Bonuses
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0899 Higher Education - Scholarship Program - Eagle Scout and Girl Scout Gold Award Recipients Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0945 /CH0275 Carroll County - Multi-Drawing Raffles Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0950 Public Schools - Civics Education Award Program Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2022 - 12:30 PM
HB1100 /CH0594 (SB0806) Child Care Providers and Employees - Bonuses Delegate Queen 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Ways and Means
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1257 (SB0155) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1394 Gaming - Skills-Based Gaming Devices - Authorization Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1452 Natural Resources - Female Deer Hunting Contests - Authorization Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0155 (HB1257) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0806 (HB1100/CH0594) Child Care Providers and Employees – Bonuses Senator King 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page