Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Audiologists and Speech Pathologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 /CH0713 (SB0379/CH0714)
Title
Health Occupation – Licensing of Audiology Assistants
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 (SB0082/CH0800)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0288 /CH0158 (SB0183)
Title
Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0711 (SB0523/CH0712)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 /CH0775 (SB0384/CH0776)
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998
Title
County Boards of Education - In-Person Instruction and Related Services - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082 /CH0800 (HB0233)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183 (HB0288/CH0158)
Title
Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0384 /CH0776 (HB0652/CH0775)
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523 /CH0712 (HB0600/CH0711)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees
Sponsor
Senator Lam
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0161 /CH0713 (SB0379/CH0714) Health Occupation – Licensing of Audiology Assistants Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0233 (SB0082/CH0800) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0288 /CH0158 (SB0183) Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact Delegate Charles 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0600 /CH0711 (SB0523/CH0712) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees Delegate Belcastro 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 711
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0652 /CH0775 (SB0384/CH0776) Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting Delegate Qi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 775
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0998 County Boards of Education - In-Person Instruction and Related Services - Requirement Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0082 /CH0800 (HB0233) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act Senator Augustine 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0183 (HB0288/CH0158) Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact Senator Young 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0384 /CH0776 (HB0652/CH0775) Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 776
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0523 /CH0712 (HB0600/CH0711) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees Senator Lam 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page