Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Auctions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 /CH0597
Title
St. Mary's County - Tax Sales - Auctioneer Expenses
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 /CH0401 (SB0092/CH0402)
Title
Real Property - Partition of Property
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0402 (HB0777/CH0401)
Title
Real Property - Partition of Property
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0522 /CH0597 St. Mary's County - Tax Sales - Auctioneer Expenses St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 /CH0401 (SB0092/CH0402) Real Property - Partition of Property Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
SB0092 /CH0402 (HB0777/CH0401) Real Property - Partition of Property Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:08 PM
Click to return on the top page