Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Auctions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0053)
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0883 /CH0545 (SB0677/CH0546)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 /CH0390
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1327
Title
Public Utilities - Transitional and Default Electric Service - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing Charges and Abandoned Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 (HB0220)
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648
Title
Vehicle Laws - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles - Public Auction
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 /CH0546 (HB0883/CH0545)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0220 (SB0053) Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0883 /CH0545 (SB0677/CH0546) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0981 /CH0390 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 390
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1327 Public Utilities - Transitional and Default Electric Service - Implementation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1330 Vehicle Laws - Towing Charges and Abandoned Vehicles Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0053 (HB0220) Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0648 Vehicle Laws - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles - Public Auction Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 /CH0546 (HB0883/CH0545) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 546
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:19 PM
Click to return on the top page