Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Associations -see also- Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011 (SB0091)
Title
Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Leasing Training Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378 /CH0961 (SB0330)
Title
State Board of Dietetic Practice - Dietitian-Nutritionists - Application Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0417 (SB0383)
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487 (SB0510)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Electric Cooperatives - Nonescheat Capital Credits
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 /CH0608 (SB0400/CH0609)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0888 /CH0605 (SB0544/CH0604)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 /CH1028 (SB0904/CH1029)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101 /CH0535 (SB0653/CH0536)
Title
Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George’s County – Enforcement of Local Vacant Property Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Martinez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Subscriber Rights and Provider Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430
Title
Education - Public Schools - Parents' Rights (Education Bill of Rights for Families Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1449 (SB1045)
Title
Zoning – Board of Appeals Decisions or Zoning Actions – Judicial Review
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 (HB0011)
Title
Workforce Development and Adult Learning – Leasing Training Program – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 (HB0417)
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 /CH0609 (HB0749/CH0608)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510 (HB0487)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Electric Cooperatives - Nonescheat Capital Credits
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 /CH0604 (HB0888/CH0605)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954
Title
Corporations and Associations - Transparency - Beneficial Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1045 (HB1449)
Title
Zoning – Board of Appeals Decisions or Zoning Actions – Judicial Review
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 (SB0091) Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Leasing Training Program - Establishment Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2024 - 2:00 PM
HB0378 /CH0961 (SB0330) State Board of Dietetic Practice - Dietitian-Nutritionists - Application Requirements Delegate Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 961
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0417 (SB0383) Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0487 (SB0510) Corporations and Associations - Electric Cooperatives - Nonescheat Capital Credits Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 /CH0608 (SB0400/CH0609) Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0888 /CH0605 (SB0544/CH0604) Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Economic Matters
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1089 /CH1028 (SB0904/CH1029) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Delegate Clippinger 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1028
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1101 /CH0535 (SB0653/CH0536) Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024) Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1142 Montgomery County and Prince George’s County – Enforcement of Local Vacant Property Laws Delegate Martinez 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1177 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Subscriber Rights and Provider Duties Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1430 Education - Public Schools - Parents' Rights (Education Bill of Rights for Families Act) Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1449 (SB1045) Zoning – Board of Appeals Decisions or Zoning Actions – Judicial Review Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2024 - 11:00 AM
SB0091 (HB0011) Workforce Development and Adult Learning – Leasing Training Program – Establishment Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0383 (HB0417) Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0400 /CH0609 (HB0749/CH0608) Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0510 (HB0487) Corporations and Associations - Electric Cooperatives - Nonescheat Capital Credits Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0544 /CH0604 (HB0888/CH0605) Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0954 Corporations and Associations - Transparency - Beneficial Ownership Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1045 (HB1449) Zoning – Board of Appeals Decisions or Zoning Actions – Judicial Review Senator Gile 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page