Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Associations -see also- Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 /CH0287 (SB0447/CH0288)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401
Title
Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Immunity From Civil Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 /CH0288 (HB0390/CH0287)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0390 /CH0287 (SB0447/CH0288) Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Economic Matters
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0401 Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0944 Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Immunity From Civil Liability Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0447 /CH0288 (HB0390/CH0287) Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:56 AM
Click to return on the top page