Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Assessments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069 /CH0644 (SB0247/CH0645)
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215
Title
Personal Property Tax - Depreciation of Assessed Value
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353 /CH0711 (SB0253/CH0712)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Landis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413 /CH0059 (SB0395)
Title
Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization – Extension of Provider Fee
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 /CH0696 (SB0917/CH0697)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635 /CH0099 (SB0539/CH0098)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Portability of Value to New Dwelling
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186 /CH0267
Title
Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans Tax Credit - Amount and Duration
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1194
Title
Condominiums - Assessment Late Fees and Liens - Notice and Timing
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1282 (SB0567/CH0643)
Title
Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1477 /CH0250
Title
Washington County - Mobile Home Parks and Mobile Home Tax - Revisions and Repeal
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0197 /CH0129 (HB0203/CH0130)
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Retroactive Qualification and Calculation of the Credit
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 /CH0645 (HB0069/CH0644)
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Real Property Assessments and Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 /CH0712 (HB0353/CH0711)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 (HB0413/CH0059)
Title
Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization – Extension of Provider Fee
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 /CH0098 (HB0635/CH0099)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Special Taxing Districts – Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 /CH0643 (HB1282)
Title
Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917 /CH0697 (HB0510/CH0696)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0069 /CH0644 (SB0247/CH0645) State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals Delegate Amprey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
Ways and Means
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0215 Personal Property Tax - Depreciation of Assessed Value Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0353 /CH0711 (SB0253/CH0712) Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments Delegate Landis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 711
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0413 /CH0059 (SB0395) Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization – Extension of Provider Fee Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0510 /CH0696 (SB0917/CH0697) Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0635 /CH0099 (SB0539/CH0098) Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Exemptions Delegate Rogers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0677 Homestead Property Tax Credit - Portability of Value to New Dwelling Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 /CH0267 Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans Tax Credit - Amount and Duration Delegate Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1194 Condominiums - Assessment Late Fees and Liens - Notice and Timing Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1282 (SB0567/CH0643) Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1477 /CH0250 Washington County - Mobile Home Parks and Mobile Home Tax - Revisions and Repeal Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Ways and Means
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0197 /CH0129 (HB0203/CH0130) Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Retroactive Qualification and Calculation of the Credit Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0247 /CH0645 (HB0069/CH0644) State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Real Property Assessments and Appeals Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2022 - 2:45 PM
SB0253 /CH0712 (HB0353/CH0711) Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Finance
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0395 (HB0413/CH0059) Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization – Extension of Provider Fee President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0539 /CH0098 (HB0635/CH0099) Anne Arundel County – Special Taxing Districts – Exemptions Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0567 /CH0643 (HB1282) Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2022 - 2:45 PM
SB0917 /CH0697 (HB0510/CH0696) Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment Senator Augustine 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Finance
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:30 PM
Click to return on the top page