Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Arrests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0006
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Quotas (Community-Oriented Policing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018
Title
Education - Reporting Arrests of Students - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Long, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175 (SB0054)
Title
Occupational Licensing and Certification - Criminal History - Predetermination Review Process
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303
Title
Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430
Title
Firearms - Liability Insurance - Public Wearing and Carrying
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0788
Title
Human Relations - Protections Against Discrimination - Criminal Records
Sponsor
Delegate Alston
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948
Title
Criminal Law - Organized Retail Theft
Sponsor
Delegate Toles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1183
Title
Criminal Procedure - District Court Commissioners and False Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Addison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1469 (SB0842)
Title
Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
Sponsor
Delegate Schmidt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 (HB0175)
Title
Occupational Licensing and Certification - Criminal History - Prohibited Disclosures and Predetermination Review Process
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082
Title
Baltimore City - Arrest Warrants for Violation of Probation - Time Frame
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0195
Title
Juveniles - Arrest by Law Enforcement - Report to Local Department of Social Services
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - School Safety and Student Well-Being - Examination of Policies and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842 (HB1469)
Title
Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0887
Title
Veterans Affairs - Responses to Arrested Veterans and Veterans in Crisis
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1145 (HB1493)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Child Sex Offenders - Prohibition on In-Person Attendance
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0006 Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Quotas (Community-Oriented Policing Act) Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0018 Education - Reporting Arrests of Students - Alterations Delegate Long, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0021 Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0175 (SB0054) Occupational Licensing and Certification - Criminal History - Predetermination Review Process Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Education, Energy, and the Environment
Economic Matters
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0303 Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0430 Firearms - Liability Insurance - Public Wearing and Carrying Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0788 Human Relations - Protections Against Discrimination - Criminal Records Delegate Alston 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744) Juvenile Law - Reform Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0948 Criminal Law - Organized Retail Theft Delegate Toles 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111) Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime Delegate Williams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 934
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1183 Criminal Procedure - District Court Commissioners and False Statements Delegate Addison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1469 (SB0842) Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official Delegate Schmidt 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0054 (HB0175) Occupational Licensing and Certification - Criminal History - Prohibited Disclosures and Predetermination Review Process Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0082 Baltimore City - Arrest Warrants for Violation of Probation - Time Frame Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2024 - 3:00 PM
SB0195 Juveniles - Arrest by Law Enforcement - Report to Local Department of Social Services Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735) Juvenile Law - Reform President 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0756 Primary and Secondary Education - School Safety and Student Well-Being - Examination of Policies and Funding Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0842 (HB1469) Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0887 Veterans Affairs - Responses to Arrested Veterans and Veterans in Crisis Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934) Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1145 (HB1493) Public and Nonpublic Schools - Child Sex Offenders - Prohibition on In-Person Attendance Senator Salling 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2024 - 9:30 AM
Ways and Means
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:44 PM
Click to return on the top page