Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Arrests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0742
Title
Education - Reportable Offenses, Student Discipline, and School Disruptions - Presence of an Attorney and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176 /CH0542
Title
Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190
Title
Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 (SB0053/CH0050)
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 (SB0452)
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement and Interrogatories in Aid of Execution - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0666
Title
Law Enforcement - Quotas
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1442 (SB0710)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 /CH0050 (HB0269)
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board - Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 (HB0349)
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement and Interrogatories in Aid of Execution - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 (HB1442)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0146 /CH0742 Education - Reportable Offenses, Student Discipline, and School Disruptions - Presence of an Attorney and Reporting Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Ways and Means
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0176 /CH0542 Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff Delegate Cardin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0190 Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0211 Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant Delegate Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0214 Juveniles - Reportable Offenses Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0269 (SB0053/CH0050) Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
Rules
HB0349 (SB0452) Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement and Interrogatories in Aid of Execution - Prohibition Delegate Moon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judiciary
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0545 Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0666 Law Enforcement - Quotas Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1442 (SB0710) Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Modifications Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0053 /CH0050 (HB0269) Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act Senator Carter 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 50
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0277 Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0309 Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board - Police Accountability Board Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0452 (HB0349) Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement and Interrogatories in Aid of Execution - Prohibition Senator Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0710 (HB1442) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Modifications Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:27 PM
Click to return on the top page