Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183 /CH0658 (SB0449)
Title
Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364 /CH0687 (SB0946/CH0688)
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 (HB0183/CH0658)
Title
Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946 /CH0688 (HB1364/CH0687)
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0121 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0183 /CH0658 (SB0449) Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2021 - 4:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1364 /CH0687 (SB0946/CH0688) Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/29/2021 - 9:30 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0449 (HB0183/CH0658) Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0946 /CH0688 (HB1364/CH0687) Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission Senator Bailey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page