Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Architects

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0213 (SB0189)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294 /CH0251 (SB0093/CH0252)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 (SB0576)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073 (SB0636/CH0583)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 /CH0252 (HB0294/CH0251)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189 (HB0213)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0740)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636 /CH0583 (HB1073)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0127 Maryland Paint Stewardship Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Hester)
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0213 (SB0189) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0294 /CH0251 (SB0093/CH0252) Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure Delegate Williams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Economic Matters
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0740 (SB0576) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1073 (SB0636/CH0583) Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0093 /CH0252 (HB0294/CH0251) Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0189 (HB0213) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB0740) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
SB0636 /CH0583 (HB1073) Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page