Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Arbitration -see also- Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 /CH0515 (SB0916)
Title
Taxes – Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894 (SB0746)
Title
Education – Community Colleges – Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0746 (HB0894)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836 /CH0361
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners Disciplinary Process and Actions Report
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 /CH0522
Title
Sheriff of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916 (HB0804/CH0515)
Title
Taxes - Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0804 /CH0515 (SB0916) Taxes – Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 515
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0894 (SB0746) Education – Community Colleges – Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0746 (HB0894) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Guzzone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0836 /CH0361 State Board of Dental Examiners Disciplinary Process and Actions Report Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0914 /CH0522 Sheriff of Baltimore City Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0916 (HB0804/CH0515) Taxes - Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:18 PM
Click to return on the top page