Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Aquaculture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145
Title
Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases, Aquaculture Leases, and Water Column Leases – Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799 /CH0457 (SB0442/CH0458)
Title
Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 /CH0169
Title
Natural Resources - Waters of the State - Mobile Locator Application
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001 (SJ0004/JR0001)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0203
Title
Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notices, Protests, Meetings, and Conflict Resolution
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350 /CH0177
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 /CH0458 (HB0799/CH0457)
Title
Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 /JR0001 (HJ0001)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0145 Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases, Aquaculture Leases, and Water Column Leases – Penalties Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0799 /CH0457 (SB0442/CH0458) Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study Delegate Clark 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 457
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0800 /CH0169 Natural Resources - Waters of the State - Mobile Locator Application Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HJ0001 (SJ0004/JR0001) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
Rules
SB0203 Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notices, Protests, Meetings, and Conflict Resolution Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0350 /CH0177 Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0442 /CH0458 (HB0799/CH0457) Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 458
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SJ0004 /JR0001 (HJ0001) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Senator Guzzone 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/06/2021 - 9:45 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:07 PM
Click to return on the top page