Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Appraisals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0599
Title
Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0600
Title
Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 /CH0401 (SB0092/CH0402)
Title
Real Property - Partition of Property
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928 (SB0875)
Title
Discrimination in Housing - Citizenship, Immigration Status, and National Origin
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031 (SB0791)
Title
Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 /CH0654
Title
Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0402 (HB0777/CH0401)
Title
Real Property - Partition of Property
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 /CH0133
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Property Appraisal Aids and Record Retention (Microfilm to Digital Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB1031)
Title
Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 (HB0928)
Title
Discrimination in Housing – Citizenship, Immigration Status, and National Origin
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0974
Title
Department of Natural Resources' Real Property - Exchange With Private Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0528 /CH0599 Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 /CH0600 Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 /CH0401 (SB0092/CH0402) Real Property - Partition of Property Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB0928 (SB0875) Discrimination in Housing - Citizenship, Immigration Status, and National Origin Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1031 (SB0791) Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1097 /CH0654 Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 654
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0092 /CH0402 (HB0777/CH0401) Real Property - Partition of Property Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judiciary
SB0201 /CH0133 State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Property Appraisal Aids and Record Retention (Microfilm to Digital Act of 2022) Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0213 State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Finance
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB1031) Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0875 (HB0928) Discrimination in Housing – Citizenship, Immigration Status, and National Origin Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0974 Department of Natural Resources' Real Property - Exchange With Private Real Property Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:21 PM
Click to return on the top page